S No. |
District |
Block |
GP |
Implementing Agency |
Project Name with code |
E-MR No. |
DateFrom--DateTo |
1 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Dilip Ganpatrao Hagir Shahabag Amba Bandhavar Krushi (1811002/IF/1235028285) |
540 |
01/12/2022--07/12/2022 |
2 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Pratap Baban Lole Shahabag Amba (1811002/IF/1235034319) |
298 |
21/07/2022--27/07/2022 |
3 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Pratap Baban Lole Shahabag Amba (1811002/IF/1235034319) |
542 |
01/12/2022--07/12/2022 |
4 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Pratap Baban Lole Shahabag Amba (1811002/IF/1235034319) |
966 |
17/02/2023--23/02/2023 |
5 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Nilesh Sunil Jamdade Shahabag kagadi limbu (1811002/IF/1235037465) |
299 |
21/07/2022--27/07/2022 |
6 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Nilesh Sunil Jamdade Shahabag kagadi limbu (1811002/IF/1235037465) |
545 |
01/12/2022--07/12/2022 |
7 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Nilesh Sunil Jamdade Shahabag kagadi limbu (1811002/IF/1235037465) |
972 |
17/02/2023--23/02/2023 |
8 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Yashwant Jagannath Jamdade shahabag limbu (1811002/IF/1235227519) |
548 |
01/12/2022--07/12/2022 |
9 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Asha Rajendra Jamdade Shahabag Amba (1811002/IF/1235227533) |
549 |
01/12/2022--07/12/2022 |
10 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Asha Rajendra Jamdade Shahabag Amba (1811002/IF/1235227533) |
990 |
17/02/2023--23/02/2023 |
11 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Namdev Nathu Jamdade Shahabag amba (1811002/IF/1235228106) |
306 |
21/07/2022--27/07/2022 |
12 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Namdev Nathu Jamdade Shahabag amba (1811002/IF/1235228106) |
550 |
01/12/2022--07/12/2022 |
13 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Namdev Nathu Jamdade Shahabag amba (1811002/IF/1235228106) |
993 |
17/02/2023--23/02/2023 |
14 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Usha Prakash Bodhale Shahabag Naral (1811002/IF/1235237986) |
308 |
21/07/2022--27/07/2022 |
15 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Usha Prakash Bodhale Shahabag Naral (1811002/IF/1235237986) |
551 |
01/12/2022--07/12/2022 |
16 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Mayur Nandkumar Jamdade Shahabag Amba (1811002/IF/1235237990) |
309 |
21/07/2022--27/07/2022 |
17 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Mayur Nandkumar Jamdade Shahabag Amba (1811002/IF/1235237990) |
552 |
01/12/2022--07/12/2022 |
18 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Agriculture (TAO WAI) |
FAL- Mayur Nandkumar Jamdade Shahabag Amba (1811002/IF/1235237990) |
1005 |
17/02/2023--23/02/2023 |
19 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Gram Panchayat (Gram Panchayat ) |
SP- Rajaram Nivrutti Waghole Shahabag (1811002077/IF/1235396518) |
198 |
30/06/2022--06/07/2022 |
20 |
SATARA |
WAI |
SHAHABAG |
Gram Panchayat (Gram Panchayat ) |
SP- Ananda Maruti Jamdade Shosh Khada Shahabag (1811002077/IF/1235534479) |
795 |
13/01/2023--19/01/2023 |